## LetsPlayMaths.Com

WELCOME TO THE WORLD OF MATHEMATICS

# Class 4 Multiplication

Multiplication by One Digit Number

Multiplication by Two Digit Number

Multiplication by Three Digit Number

Story Time Multiplication

Multiplication Test

Multiplication Worksheet

## Multiplication by One Digit Number

We have learnt multiplication of 4/5 digit numbers by 1,2, and 3-digit numbers. We will use same method for multiplication of 6 or 7-digit numbers by 1, 2 and 3-digit numbers without or with carrying. Few examples are given below.

Example 1. Multiply 241321 by 2.

Solution.
O - Ones
T - Tens
H - Hundred
Th - Thousands
T-Th - Ten Thousand
L- Lakh
T-L - Ten Lakh
Cr - Crore Thus, the result is 482642.

Example 2. Multiply 3212478 by 4.

Solution. Thus, the result is 12849912.

## Multiplication by Two Digit Number

68 X 29 = 68 X (20 + 9)
Multiply by ones, 68 X 9 = 612
Multiply by tens, 68 X 20 = 1360
Add 1360 and 612. 1360 + 612 = 1972 So, the result is 1972.

Example 1. Multiply 234516 by 12.

Solution. ## Multiplication by Three Digit Number

435 X 236 = 435 X (200 + 30 + 6) So, the answer is 435 X 236 = 102660

Example 1. Multiply 90453 and 235.

Solution. ## Story Time Multiplication

Story time multiplication are solved in the same manner as they were done in the previous classes. In this class we will be using bigger numbers.

Example 1. A school has 520 students, each student got Rs. 25625 as admission fees. How much money school received?

Solution.
Each student got admission fees = ₹ 25625
520 student admission fees will be = ₹ 25625 X 520 Example 2. A woman earns ₹ 125726 per month. How much does she earn in a year?

Solution.
Woman salary per month = ₹ 125726
In 12 months she will earn = ₹ 125726 X 12 She earns ₹ 1508612 in a year.

## Multiplication Test

Multiplication Test - 1

Multiplication Test - 2

## Class-4 Multiplication Worksheet

Multiplication Worksheet - 1

Multiplication Worksheet - 2

Multiplication Worksheet - 3

Multiplication Worksheet - 4

Multiplication Worksheet - 5